|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 6933.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 5003.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on E., R., & C.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 8. Page 5516.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E.,R. & S.S. and E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|