|
05/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|