08/19/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/20/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/20/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 5239.) | |||
04/22/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 21). | |||
04/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 5). | |||
02/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/09/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | |||
02/08/2010 | Read first time. To print. |