|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5835.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4058.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5191.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|