|
08/18/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4374.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5278.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|