06/03/2010 | Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 27. Noes 37. Page 5589.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 5). | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 20). | |||
03/16/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/09/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | |||
02/08/2010 | Read first time. To print. |