|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment. (Corrected August 16.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4409.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5247.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|