|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 31. Page 5129.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|