|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 88, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:50 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2173.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1296.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 626.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (March 17).
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|