|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 85, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5924.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4098.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4546.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|