|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 4817.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 5401.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|