|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 364, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6859.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4964.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5284.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|