|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 451, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 6280.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4485.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4797.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|