05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/21/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/13/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/12/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |||
04/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/16/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
02/10/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | |||
02/09/2010 | Read first time. To print. |