California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1769 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/09/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1769INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Tran FEBRUARY 9, 2010 An act relating to elections, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1769, as introduced, Tran. Elections: County of Orange. The Budget Act of 2009 appropriated specified amounts from the General Fund for support of election-related costs. This bill would appropriate $1,639,000 from the General Fund to the Controller to reimburse the County of Orange for the special election costs incurred by the county to fill a vacancy in the 72nd Assembly District. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The sum of one million six hundred thirty-nine thousand dollars ($1,639,000) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Controller to reimburse the County of Orange for the special election costs incurred by the county to fill a vacancy in the 72nd Assembly District, in accordance with the following schedule: (1) November 17, 2009, Special Primary 804,000 Election ............................. (2) January 12, 2010, Special General 835,000 Election ............................. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: The budget for the County of Orange contains funding authority to support one statewide election per fiscal year. In order to reimburse the County of Orange as soon as possible for the costs incurred in conducting the special primary election and special general election to fill the vacancy in the 72nd Assembly District, and thereby enable the county to conduct the regularly scheduled statewide primary election on June 8, 2010, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.