|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 342, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6464.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4599.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3861.)
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 5).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|