|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5402.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|