|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 241, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6559.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4412.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5243.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|