|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6383.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4586.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4821.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|