05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/05/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |||
04/08/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |||
04/07/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/06/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/23/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |||
02/11/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |||
02/10/2010 | Read first time. To print. |