LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB179
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB179
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB179
Compare Versions
AB179 Amended June 16, 2010
AB179 Amended September 2, 2009
AB179 Amended June 29, 2009
AB179 Amended April 29, 2009
AB179 Amended March 31, 2009
AB179 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB179 Amended June 16, 2010
AB179 Amended September 2, 2009
AB179 Amended June 29, 2009
AB179 Amended April 29, 2009
AB179 Amended March 31, 2009
AB179 Introduced February 2, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare