|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 6655.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 4848.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 19. Noes 14. Page 4466.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Kehoe. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4467.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 15. Page 4935.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|