California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1793 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/20/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1793ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Saldana FEBRUARY 10, 2010 An act to amend Section 1353.8 of the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1793, Saldana. Common interest developments: artificial turf. Existing law requires a local agency to adopt a specified updated model ordinance regarding water-efficient landscapes or a water-efficient landscape ordinance that is at least as effective in conserving water as the updated model ordinance. Existing law allows certain water providers to take specified actions regarding water conservation. The Davis-Stirling Common Interest Development Act provides for the creation and regulation of common interest developments. That act provides that a provision of any of the governing documents of a common interest development is void and unenforceable if it prohibits, or includes conditions that have the effect of prohibiting, the use of low water-using plants as a group, or if it has the effect of prohibiting or restricting compliance with a local water-efficient landscape ordinance or water conservation measure as described above. This bill would provide that a provision of any of the governing documents of a common interest development would be void and unenforceable if it prohibits, or includes conditions that have the effect of prohibiting, the use of artificial turf or any other synthetic surface that resembles grass. This prohibition would not prohibit an association from applying landscape rules and regulations established in governing documents that establish design standards and quality standards for the installation of artificial turf, or any other synthetic surface that resembles grass, to the extent the rules and regulations do not prohibit the use of artificial turf or any other synthetic surface that resembles grass. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1353.8 of the Civil Code is amended to read: 1353.8. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a provision of any of the governing documents of a common interest development shall be void and unenforceable if it does any of the following: (1) Prohibits, or includes conditions that have the effect of prohibiting, the use of low water-using plants as a group. (2) Prohibits, or includes conditions that have the effect of prohibiting, the use of artificial turf or any other synthetic surface that resembles grass. (3) Has the effect of prohibiting or restricting compliance with either of the following: (A) A water-efficient landscape ordinance adopted or in effect pursuant to subdivision (c) of Section 65595 of the Government Code. (B) Any regulation or restriction on the use of water adopted pursuant to Section 353 or 375 of the Water Code. (b) (1) This section shall not prohibit an association from applying landscaping rules and regulations established in the governing documents, to the extent the rules and regulations fully conform with the requirements of subdivision (a). (2) This section shall not prohibit an association from applying landscape rules and regulations established in governing documents that establish design standards and quality standards for the installation of artificial turf, or any other synthetic surface that resembles grass, to the extent the rules and regulations conform with the requirements of paragraph (2) of subdivision (a).