LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1805
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1805
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1805
Action History
04/19/2010
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
03/22/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
02/25/2010
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
02/11/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
02/10/2010
Read first time. To print.