05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/19/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/10/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/17/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 16). | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
02/11/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |||
02/10/2010 | Read first time. To print. |