|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6520.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4491.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Corrected June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4928.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 4851.).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|