|
11/30/2010
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator DeSaulnier.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 18. Noes 18. Page 5032.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5032.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 5584.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|