06/03/2010 | Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 33. Noes 36. Page 5586.) | |||
03/25/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
03/24/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (March 23). | |||
03/10/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/09/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/12/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | |||
02/11/2010 | Read first time. To print. |