|
05/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|