01/05/2010 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Ma. | |||
10/26/2009 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after October 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3553.) | |||
10/14/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2533.) | |||
09/12/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 23. Noes 6. Page 2450.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Ducheny. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2451.) | |||
09/08/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
09/04/2009 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |||
06/11/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |||
05/14/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/04/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/04/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 1224.) | |||
03/31/2009 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
02/03/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |||
02/02/2009 | Read first time. To print. |