|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 6522.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4676.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5418.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|