|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 6907.) (Corrected September 14.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 5027.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 19. Noes 11. Page 4980.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wright. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4980.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 5492.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 20.)
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|