|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 5519.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|