|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 366, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6472.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 4674.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4942.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A. by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 16).
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|