|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6656.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4841.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5567.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5386.).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|