09/23/2010 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
09/07/2010 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m. | |||
08/24/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/24/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 4848.) | |||
06/17/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 15). | |||
04/29/2010 | Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
04/05/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/05/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 4446.) | |||
03/17/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 16). | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
02/12/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | |||
02/11/2010 | Read first time. To print. |