LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1833
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1833
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1833
Action History
04/06/2010
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
03/23/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
02/25/2010
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and NAT. RES.
02/16/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
02/12/2010
Read first time. To print.