|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6484.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 4710.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected August 19.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5496.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|