|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6383.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4586.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 5339.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5240.).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|