04/19/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/13/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/12/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 7). | |||
04/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/11/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and ED. | |||
02/16/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |||
02/12/2010 | Read first time. To print. |