|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6526.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4583.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 11). In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4400.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 1. Page 2446.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Price. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2446.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 1225.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|