|
09/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 219, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6826.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4832.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5549.) Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5562.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5447.).
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|