|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6447.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4573.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5426.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|