|
08/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6084.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4308.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5159.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|