|
08/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6079.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4201.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5198.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered returned to second day Consent Calendar by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|