06/22/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5147.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |||
02/16/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |||
02/12/2010 | Read first time. To print. |