|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 239, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6149.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4373.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4976.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|