|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 4699.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5142.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|