|
08/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 198, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:55 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6092.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4374.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5448.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|