|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 367, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6156.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4413.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5050.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|